GRACE CHURCH, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To demonstrate the Christian faith in action by being a church in the Cambridge area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
86 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
- GRACE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brendan Joseph Beatan | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jo Rigby | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Menown Gordon Dalzell | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Garry | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rowland | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Derek Roberts | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Doel | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dobson | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW BORG | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.37k | £314.26k | £235.53k | £238.54k | £239.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.45k | £254.56k | £293.41k | £261.42k | £247.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2024 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 21 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT AND PRACTICE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFITAS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF THE CHARITY. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD, PROVIDED THEY ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A Home Close
Histon
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9JL
- Phone:
- 07446330655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window