CHALE RECREATION GROUND LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Discussions with the planners regarding the provision of changing facilities on the field to enable the playing of team sports have continued. The associated fund raising has commenced. In the meantime, the directors will encourage the widest use of the field consistent with the constraint that a lack of permanent facilities brings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 28 December 2012: Standard registration
- 04 October 2013: Funds received from 258041 CHALE SCOUTS HALL
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM GROVES FCIB | Chair | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Edwin Joyce | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GRAHAM IRVING | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Raymond Lock | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Rebecca Lock | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Peter Kimber | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BERNARD HARDY | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £1.29k | £4.02k | £16.19k | £15.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £2.97k | £3.51k | £3.60k | £5.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF CHALE DEFINED BY RED EDGING ON THE PLAN ANNEXED TO THESE ARTICLES("THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION,LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH,OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF,A RECREATION GROUND AND TO MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS AND REMAINING NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pheasant Hill
Pyle Shute
Chale
Ventnor
PO38 2LE
- Phone:
- 01983551379
- Email:
- malcolm.groves@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window