BARKING KIDZ KLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barking Kidz Klub is fun and exciting club for 5 to 11 years old. It uses games, competitions, songs, stories and drama and introduce the Christian Faith to local kids in an unthreatening, fun and friendly manner. The main areas of our work: Weekly Kidz Klub sessions Weekly home visits to children and families Community work and events School work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 05 December 2012: Standard registration
- 15 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 15 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1015872 KING'S CHURCH,BARKING
- KIDZ KLUB BARKING (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14k | £3.95k | £3.70k | £3.77k | £2.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.23k | £4.01k | £3.65k | £3.20k | £2.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE CONSTITUTION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window