Financial history GRASSROOTS SUICIDE PREVENTION

Charity number: 1149873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £539.66k £478.93k £892.13k £730.19k £925.94k
Total expenditure £463.17k £349.88k £665.21k £801.08k £925.14k
Income from government contracts £41.13k £95.60k £93.27k £111.38k £192.06k
Income from government grants £129.62k £25.00k £182.27k £75.05k £42.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £111.99k N/A £207.54k £123.50k £127.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £8.00k £5.63k £2.50k
Income - Charitable activities £425.70k N/A £667.68k £600.49k £793.66k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £50 N/A £72 £573 £2.06k
Income - Other £1.92k N/A £8.84k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £442.83k N/A £616.05k £765.61k £894.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.34k N/A £49.15k £35.47k £30.43k
Expenditure - Governance £7.16k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0