Accounts and annual returns THE PTA OF ETZ CHAIM JEWISH PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1149950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2023 16 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2021 28 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2020 11 August 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2020 Not Required