Financial history FRIENDS OF LEINTWARDINE ENDOWED PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1149976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.04k £556 £722 £5.73k £4.78k
Total expenditure £7.31k £3.86k £1.28k £4.90k £3.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A