THE BETH JACOB YOUTH MOVEMENT

Charity Number: 1150103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of youth clubs for Orthodox Jewish students in a safe environment with the provision of appropriate leisure activities and facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,157

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2012: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 26 October 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • NONE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIASZ ENGLANDER Trustee 28 November 2012
ORGANISATION FOR THE SUPPORT OF TORAH EDUCATION LIMITED
Received: On time
JOSEPH LEIB WEISS Trustee 28 November 2012
FRIENDS OF MOSDOS BELZ MACHNOVKA
Received: On time
BEIS MINCHAS YITZCHOK TRUST
Received: On time
ORGANISATION FOR THE SUPPORT OF TORAH EDUCATION LIMITED
Received: On time
KOLEL BELZ MACHNOVKEH LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ZECHARIA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RIDGESAVE LIMITED
Received: On time
KOLLEL MISHKON YAKOV
Hannah Zelda Weiss Trustee 28 November 2012
RIDGESAVE LIMITED
Received: On time
KEREN ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
MENACHEM GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SIDE BY SIDE (CHILDREN) LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.14k £177 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £17.22k £13.58k £5.84k £2.67k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 April 2023 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ENGLANDER
136 CLAPTON COMMON
LONDON
E5 9AG
Phone:
02088029736
Website:

No information available