THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ALL SAINTS ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RIPLEY, DERBYSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship.Provision of sacred space for prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work.Visits to sick & bereaved.Teaching Christianity by sermons,small groups & taking assemblies in schools.Promotion of Christianity.Promoting the whole mission of the Church in activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers & other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK & overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £720 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 07 January 2013: Previously excepted registration
- RIPLEY ALL SAINTS CHURCH PCC, DERBYSHIRE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NICOLA JOY HAMBLEY | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER SUGDEN | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Rudland Ferguson | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Carol Parsons | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noele Margaret Johnson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Davies | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janette Lesley Smeeton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Pamela Jean Macnaughton | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Maria Edwards | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Arthur Lane | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Michael | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill CROOKS | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FLEMMING | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIM BROOKES | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHIL BESTWICK | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY ROBERTS | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE Bestwick | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV MARIAN BROOKES | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.43k | £94.80k | £88.95k | £93.45k | £102.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.12k | £96.71k | £92.42k | £94.62k | £93.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £648 | £237 | £720 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Moseley Street
RIPLEY
DE5 3DA
- Phone:
- 01773570011
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window