PRACTICAL TOOLS INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship anywhere in the world by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training, healthcare projects and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient in particular by collecting, refurbishing and supplying used tools to those with a charitable need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liberia
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 05 June 2013: Standard registration
- PRACTICAL TOOLS INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hawah Gamanga | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bockarie Musa | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Archielia Barbara James | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Fallah-Williams | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.97k | £177.09k | £145.03k | £149.36k | £180.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.46k | £342.52k | £168.07k | £151.07k | £167.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 June 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 June 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT IN PARTICULAR BY COLLECTING, REFURBISHING AND SUPPLYING USED TOOLS TO THOSE WITH A CHARITABLE NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Fareham Community Church
Church Office
18 Russell Place
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO16 7FH
- Phone:
- 07800586533
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window