UK SHAOLIN TEMPLE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our goal is to promote the vision of "living well". By incorporating elements of Chan Buddhism and Shaolin culture into their lives, any individual can be assisted to achieve this vision. 1. Teaching resources of Chan Buddhism 2. Improve health & develop insight 3. Teaching and developing Shaolin culture 4. Working in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 February 2013: Standard registration
- UK SHAOLIN TEMPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Lucas | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANINE BRAUER | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SUSAN CHEN | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHI YANMING | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.71k | £90.08k | £29.06k | £95.38k | £73.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.30k | £76.20k | £27.61k | £89.41k | £115.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £10.00k | £26.00k | £15.44k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
18 July 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 August 2022 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 August 2022 | 119 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/01/2013
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHAN BUDDHISM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING A TEMPLE FOR THE STUDY OF CHAN BUDDHISM AND SHAOLIN CULTURE 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHAN CULTURE AND HERITAGE. 3) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THE PUBLIC BY TEACHING CHAN BUDDHISM AND SHAOLIN KUNG FU.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 81A
Marlands Shopping Centre
Above Bar Street
SOUTHAMPTON
- Phone:
- 07935380789
- Email:
- ukstmail@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window