THE LIBERAL CATHOLIC CHURCH CORPORATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include the maintenance and support of clergy and congregations in the UK and Ireland with the work of the Church.The maintenance of Church buildings. Supporting the work of the Presiding Bishop and overseas Bishops, clergy and congregations. The Parochial Fund supports the work of the Pro-Cathedral Church of All Saints, Putney, its clergy and congregation. Public religious services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Birmingham City
- City Of Swansea
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Liverpool City
- Surrey
- Wandsworth
- West Sussex
- Argentina
- Australia
- Brazil
- Cameroon
- Chile
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Togo
- United States
- Uruguay
Governance
- 27 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIGHT REVEREND RICHARD BEDDOW BAYLY | Chair | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christine Valerie Anthony | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Martin Shepherd | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VERY REVEREND COLIN RONALD HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
VERY REVEREND CHARLES MENSAH BOSSMAN | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.45k | £0 | £600 | £0 | £208 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07k | £11.40k | £23.58k | £9.04k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 OCT 1938 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/02/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, AS EXPRESSED IN THE NINTH EDITION OF THE STATEMENT OF PRINCIPLES AND SUMMARY OF DOCTRINE OF THE LIBERAL CATHOLIC CHURCH ATTACHED AS ANNEX 1, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND SACRAMENTS; THE CONDUCTING OF OTHER RELIGIOUS SERVICES; BY HOLDING LECTURES, MEETING AND CONGRESSES; BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF LIBERAL CATHOLIC LITERATURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
St. Albans
Tekels Park
Camberley
GU15 2LE
- Phone:
- 0127625050
- Email:
- LCCCORPORATION1@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window