NEWTOWN LINFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall Lettings and Fund Raising Events to promote, support and maintain village life and the Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 October 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Andrew Palethorpe | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Houghton | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
George Benjamin Reynolds | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Harrold | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Avery Hancock | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Terence Hall | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Scrine | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANNE BREWSTER | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Toby Manning | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH PRITCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET MARGARET BRUNTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Parish Council of Newtown Linford | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.07k | £7.71k | £14.48k | £21.23k | £24.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.99k | £15.11k | £13.19k | £17.60k | £29.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DATED 3 JANUARY 1974 AND ORDER OF 27 MAY 2004 as amended on 15 Jun 2001
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWTOWN LINFORD IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTER, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWTOWN LINFORD LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newtown Linford Village Hall
Main Street
Newtown Linford
LEICESTER
LE6 0AE
- Phone:
- 01530243159
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window