SUFI SPIRITUAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the principles of sufism within Islam in particular but not exclusively through the provision of a library, lectures and other information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 13 February 2013: Standard registration
- 04 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- SSC (Working name)
- SUFI SPIRITUAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.71k | £24.02k | £24.50k | £87.69k | £90.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.54k | £21.21k | £25.61k | £85.88k | £90.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 02 January 2018 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 02 January 2018 | 63 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 November 2016 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF SUFISM WITHIN ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY, MEDITATION CLASSES, LECTURES AND OTHER INFORMATION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window