Financial history Near East Foundation UK

Charity number: 1150993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.15m £4.60m £6.93m £4.36m £3.92m
Total expenditure £3.34m £4.50m £4.25m £6.13m £4.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.32k £444.48k £26.33k £19.06k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £465.80k £415.60k £545.06k £611.91k £563.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.68m £4.19m £6.39m £3.54m £2.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £203.25k £389.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.34m £4.38m £4.25m £6.13m £4.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £101.85k £95.10k £5.50k £22.85k £217.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £126.08k £0 £0 £237.59k