Financial history BEDLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1151177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.26k £39.86k £44.63k £56.24k £51.44k
Total expenditure £46.91k £35.45k £26.07k £53.81k £67.11k
Income from government contracts £6.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.60k £500 N/A