LUTON STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making Luton centre safe at night between 10pm-4am on Friday and Saturdays caring listening and helping those who have become vulnerable Working in partnership with the Police SOS Bus pubs and clubs and local authority to reduce anti-social behaviour and public disorder offences.Flip-flops blankets water wipes lollipops directions assistance and a listening pastoral ear are freely available to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Luton
Governance
- 03 January 2013: Standard registration
- LSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivan Gedeon | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Morgan-Stewart | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191 | £253 | £0 | £1.14k | £523 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £1.18k | £843 | £1.03k | £659 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/12/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN LUTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN LUTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LICENCE AGREEMENT EXECUTED WITH ASCENSION TRUST AND THE CORE VALUES AND MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LUTON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOFC
27-29 Alma Street
Luton
Luton
LU1 2PL
- Phone:
- 01582520444
- Email:
- luton@streetpastors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window