Accounts and annual returns YOUTH PHILANTHROPY EDUCATION

Charity number: 1151353
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 01 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 01 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2014 24 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 24 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 04 June 2014 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required