Financial history THE FORUM (NORTHALLERTON) LTD

Charity number: 1150546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £281.43k £146.46k £314.11k £375.80k £452.85k
Total expenditure £291.57k £160.95k £323.15k £369.79k £401.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £58.53k £52.86k £5.69k N/A N/A