EPIC PARTNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing after-school programmes. Delivering Community Games holiday programmes. Designing and delivering swimming programmes. Developing football in the area. Working with families. Establishing emotional well-being support for parents. Promoting facilities in the local area. Positive promotion and use of local parks and venues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,955 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Margaret Douglas | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Simon Tutin | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James David Butler | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jingying Tung | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kingstun Levi Barrett Nelson | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Stevens | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Sarah Temple | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE SWINGLER | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PAUL SLOAN | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.09k | £344.65k | £431.64k | £352.86k | £354.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.60k | £278.11k | £367.66k | £432.83k | £406.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.75k | N/A | £7.04k | £42.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO UNDERTAKE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING:- (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN THE ST ANN'S AND SNEINTON AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM; (2) THE PROMOTION OF, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ST ANN'S AND SNEINTON AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, SPORT OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE ST ANN'S AND SNEINTON AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM; AND (4) THE PROMOTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULAR IN AND AROUND THE ST ANN'S AND SNEINTON AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Epic Partners
The Oliver Hind Youth Club
Edale Road
Nottingham
NG2 4HT
- Phone:
- 01158372021
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window