SUDLEY INFANT PARENTS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold several fundraising school community events throughout the school year which include our children, families & teachers of the school. At each event money is raised to put back into our school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 15 November 2012: Standard registration
- SIPFA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Bridge | Chair | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE RILEY | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE O'BRIEN | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2017 | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.40k | £8.36k | £13.87k | £5.78k | £7.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.53k | £6.62k | £8.90k | £6.63k | £6.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOV 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sudley Infant School
63 Dundonald Road
Liverpool
L17 0AE
- Phone:
- 0151 727 1139
- Email:
- sipfa@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window