RUGBY LEAGUE CARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rugby League Cares is the Rugby League's national charity, dedicated to supporting the Rugby League family and its local communities. Our mission is to enhance and enrich people's lives through the power and positive influence of Rugby League. Rugby League Cares supports Rugby League's broad community - Past, Present & Future:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,637,926
Donations and legacies | £1.52m | |
Charitable activities | £41.97k | |
Other trading activities | £76.29k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,497,850
Raising funds | £648.16k | |
Charitable activities | £849.69k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £648.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £849.69k | |
Retained for future use | £140.08k |
People

18 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN SINFIELD | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
GARY HETHERINGTON | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Sutcliffe | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Walton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Karen Elizabeth Moorhouse | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Neville Alan Smith | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY LAWRENCE ADAMS | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £896.23k | £884.87k | £1.03m | £1.33m | £1.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £849.44k | £867.86k | £939.30k | £1.09m | £1.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £83.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £240.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £731.98k | £765.94k | £924.20k | £1.13m | £1.52m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £113.00k | £82.37k | £78.08k | £172.72k | £76.29k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £51.25k | £29.26k | £31.03k | £21.69k | £41.97k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £7.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £346.21k | £253.86k | £383.15k | £772.39k | £849.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £503.23k | £614.00k | £556.15k | £317.12k | £648.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.54k | £5.54k | £4.80k | £0 | £5.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £340.67k | £0 | £378.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £355.18k | £357.99k | £362.92k | £361.15k | £306.02k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £325.39k | £347.25k | £503.76k | £778.51k | £661.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £528.99k | £536.64k | £604.06k | £640.19k | £328.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1.1 ORGANISING OR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND MEMBERS OF YOUTH ORGANISATIONS IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OTHER FOREIGN JURISDICTION TO PLAY RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL AND OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THIS OBJECT: (A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL OR GAMES OR SPORTS EQUIPMENT FOR THE USE OF SUCH PUPILS AS AFORESAID; (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS AND COACHING FOR PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND MEMBERS OF YOUTH ORGANISATIONS IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OTHER FOREIGN JURISDICTION AND FOR TEACHERS WHO ORGANISE OR SUPERVISE PLAYING AND COACHING OF RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AT SUCH SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS AS AFORESAID; (C) TO PROMOTE PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF TRAINING COLLEGES FOR THE PURPOSES OF TRAINING TEACHERS IN THE COACHING OF RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AT SUCH SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS AS AFORESAID; AND (D) TO LAY OUT MANAGE EQUIP AND MAINTAIN OR ASSIST IN THE LAYING OUT, MANAGEMENT, EQUIPMENT OR MAINTENANCE OF PLAYING FIELDS OR APPROPRIATE INDOOR FACILITIES OR ACCOMMODATION TO BE USED FOR THE TEACHING AND PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL OR OTHER SPORTS. 4.1.2 ORGANISING OR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BOYS AND GIRLS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 4.1.3 PROVIDING SUCH FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM FIT FOR THE PROVISION, ESTABLISHMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE OR RUGBY LEAGUE IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER SPORTS ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND AND BUILDINGS (INCLUDING PITCHES, PAVILIONS AND STADIA), EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING EVENTS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES). 4.1.4 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE HERITAGE, HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF RUGBY LEAGUE AND ITS ANTECEDENTS IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY:- (A) ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING A MUSEUM OPEN TO THE PUBLIC FOR THE PERMANENT EXHIBITION AND PRESERVATION OF RUGBY MEMORABILIA AND OTHER ITEMS OF EDUCATIONAL ARTISTIC AND/OR HISTORIC VALUE OR SIGNIFICANCE; (B) COLLECTING, COLLATING AND ARCHIVING DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIALS (IN WHATEVER MEDIUM) OF EDUCATIONAL ARTISTIC AND/OR HISTORIC VALUE OR SIGNIFICANCE WHICH SHALL BE MADE AVAILABLE IN THE PUBLIC DOMAIN AND PROMOTING THE PERUSAL AND USE OF SUCH MATERIALS FOR RESEARCH PURPOSES. (C) PROMOTING INTEREST IN RUGBY LEAGUE THROUGH THE ARTS AND OTHER CREATIVE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY. 4.1.5 TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO PLAY OR WHO HAVE PLAYED OR WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ASSOCIATED WITH THE GAME OF RUGBY FOOTBALL LEAGUE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OTHER FOREIGN JURISDICTION AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUPPORT BY REASON OF POVERTY, AGE OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF HUDDERSFIELD
QUEENSGATE
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 3DH
- Phone:
- 07597098111
- Email:
- info@rlcares.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window