Accounts and annual returns UNITED KINGDOM PUNJAB HERITAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1152752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 01 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2023 01 November 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 26 January 2023 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 26 January 2023 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 05 April 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 05 April 2021 155 days late Download Open in new window