ECOWORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ecoworks is a Nottingham based charity that promotes the interests and personal development of people who are socially disadvantaged by delivering activities connected with the conservation, restoration and enhancement of the environment. It currently manages one site on Hungerhill Gardens in St Ann's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Billy Rebecchi | Chair | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wallace | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Roy Powell | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Louise Stubley | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Claire McEwan | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Butler | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.10k | £10.57k | £26.33k | £45.94k | £26.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.66k | £19.30k | £20.29k | £27.79k | £38.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:(A)THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:UNEMPLOYMENT;FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;YOUTH OR OLD AGE;ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL);SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS;DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX,RACE,DISABILITY,ETHNIC ORIGIN RELIGION,BELIEF,CREED,SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT;POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT;RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN;POOR HOUSING(THATIS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS;CRIME(EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY;(B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION;(C)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY;(D)THE CONSERVATION,RESTORATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE BIOLOGICAL ENVIRONMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o STAA Visitor Centre
121 Ransom Road
St Anns
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG3 3LH
- Phone:
- 07956762030
- Email:
- info@ecoworks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window