DESTINY CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Destiny Chapel's objectives are to advance the Christian faith (in Accordance with the statement of beliefs) to proclaim and further the gospel of God and his Son the Lord Jesus Christ, and to preach and teach the Christian faith. The advancement of education for the public benefit. The relief pf poverty for those in need in the UK and overseas as the trustees decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Thurrock
Governance
- 22 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dr OLUWOLE SAMUEL SOWUNMI | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANK GAISIE | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev PRINCE OSEI-GYAMFI | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr LOUISA BOATENG-GAISIE | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | £14.87k | £9.67k | £18.93k | £20.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.10k | £7.22k | £5.73k | £14.61k | £11.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/11/2013
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THOSE IN NEED IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harris Ockendon Academy
Erriff Drive
SOUTH OCKENDON
Essex
RM15 5AY
- Phone:
- 07376282547
- Email:
- destinychapel@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window