CHILDREN'S HELPERS WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHW supports children and youth in less developed parts of the world, through giving grants to local organisations, which work with children and young people everyday. Grants are given to projects which relieve poverty, advance education, relieve sickness and promote good health and offer recreational activities which develop the children's and young people' skills and capabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Argentina
- China
- Ghana
- Romania
- South Africa
Governance
- 18 September 2013: Standard registration
- CHW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE FRANKS LLM | Chair | 21 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA HUGHES | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Franks | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNA BOOTH | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/04/2020 | 22/04/2021 | 22/04/2022 | 22/04/2023 | 22/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.38k | £38.11k | £39.92k | £23.79k | £46.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.07k | £31.26k | £39.46k | £27.87k | £26.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24 AUG 2016 as amended on 21 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO SUPPORT THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- A) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING PHYSICAL EDUCATION, OF YOUNG PEOPLE NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; D) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BROOKFIELD AVENUE
LONDON
W5 1LA
- Phone:
- 02089989026
- Email:
- info@chworldwide.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window