FRIENDS OF FARNHAM COMMON INFANT SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary aim of the charity to is raise funds on behalf of Farnham Common Village Schools. The charity carries out a number of fund raising events, and these include, but are not limited to; Auctions, Sports days, Picnics, Quiz nights, Raffles. The primary activity is to raise funds for the school but as an ancillary benefit many of the events also prove an enjoyable experience for pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
Governance
- 06 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Macdonald | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Austin | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Lee Weeks | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Fitzgerald | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Childs | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ballinger-Bull | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amandeep Nagra | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA ROSE | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Feeney | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Ayres | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.77k | £23.08k | £4.79k | £24.57k | £39.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.52k | £15.59k | £1.60k | £27.86k | £38.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farnham Common Infant School
Beaconsfield Road
Farnham Common
Slough
SL2 3HS
- Phone:
- 01753 645899
- Email:
- friendsoffcis@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window