Financial history Obesity UK

Charity number: 1150683
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £8.56k £12.32k £9.82k £6.96k £87.50k
Total expenditure £20.89k £20.08k £14.51k £6.50k £51.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A