Obesity UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and signposting for those who struggle with obesity. To be the voice of the person living with obesity so as to bring awareness to the issues surrounding obesity. To work with existing weight management bodies to improve services To provide financial help to allow specific individuals to attend weight management services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 February 2013: Standard registration
- HELP OVERCOMING OBESITY PROBLEMS (Working name)
- Obesity UK (Working name)
- HOOP (UK) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Gately | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £12.32k | £9.82k | £6.96k | £87.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.89k | £20.08k | £14.51k | £6.50k | £51.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 October 2023 | 541 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/01/2013 as amended on 13 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT IN RELATION TO DIET, NUTRITION, LIFESTYLE, FITNESS AND PHYSICAL EXERCISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Pear Tree Close
Lightcliffe
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 8RY
- Phone:
- 07590395660
- Email:
- ken.clare@obesityuk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window