IRIS PRIZE OUTREACH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training and education in film production and the promotion of equality and diversity specifically by working to eliminate discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation by supporting film productions made by winners of the Iris Prize, Cardiff's international lesbian and gay short film prize.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Abell | Chair | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Lawrence | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Linda Suzanne Davies | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Lagan | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Blanc | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RACSTER | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.34k | £97.85k | £162.08k | £178.46k | £204.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.05k | £81.65k | £160.90k | £166.44k | £172.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION(INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)OF PEOPLE IN THE ARTS OF THE MOVING IMAGE AND THE PRODUCTION OF MOVING IMAGE WORKS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT,INCLUDING BY:(A)AWARDING SUCH PERSONS PRIZES OR SCHOLARSHIPS TO FACILITATE THEM IN THE PRODUCTION OF MOVING IMAGE WORK;(B)PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION(INCLUDING THE STUDY OF FILM,MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS)TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION,TRADE OR PROFESSION RELEVANT TO THE FILM AND TELEVISION PRODUCTION INDUSTRIES.AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:(A)WORKING FOR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION;(B)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY;(C)PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS;(D)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Iris Prize
Chapter
Market Road
CARDIFF
CF5 1QE
- Phone:
- 029 20232744
- Email:
- grant@irisprize.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window