BLUE APPLE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blue Apple Theatre seeks to empower people with learning disabilities through theatre, dance and film. It achieves this by providing them with opportunities to participate in regular, integrated drama and dance sessions leading to public performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Patricia Frater | Chair | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Stockel | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Paul Gifford | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Louise Taylor | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Tomlinson | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Louise Bennett | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Stevens Weston | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Stuart Rutter | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.04k | £134.47k | £189.20k | £267.50k | £212.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.95k | £148.51k | £179.93k | £233.01k | £219.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.93k | £6.13k | £3.75k | £21.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2013
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, ENHANCING THEIR CAPACITY AND IMPROVING THEIR LIFE OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH THE USE OF A VARIETY OF PERFORMANCE MEDIA, AND BY BUILDING A MORE INTEGRATED SOCIETY THROUGH GREATER UNDERSTANDING AND VALUING OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES. 2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of Winchester
Sparkford Road
Winchester
Hampshire
SO22 4NR
- Phone:
- 01962827352
- Email:
- admin@blueappletheatre.com
- Website:
-
blueappletheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window