GB SRS BRUNDAVAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please visit http://www.gb-srsbrundavan.org/ for details on all the charity activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 February 2013: Standard registration
- GB-SRSB MUTT, SRSB MUTT, MAN-SRSB & MADHWA PARISHAT UK. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARGESHNARI RAGHUNATHA RAO BADRINATH | Chair | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAGAVENDIRAN GOVINDA RAO | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIDYASAGAR JYOSHI | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PRAHLLADA PUROHIT | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SRIHARI GUBBI NAGARAJ | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.72k | £69.30k | £35.08k | £58.50k | £98.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.68k | £79.04k | £32.04k | £70.38k | £95.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”)ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 White Hart Road
SLOUGH
SL1 2SF
- Phone:
- 07500067891
- Email:
- info@gb-srsbrundavan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window