GLOBAL AID UK

Charity Number: 1150787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

UK - centres for learning,recreation,advice. BANGLADESH:Water&Energy Fund - tube wells,gas,electric,solar. Medical Fund - clinics,mobile medics. Family Welfare Fund - nursery,community centre,marriage & legal aid. Sports&Fitness Fund - sports academies. Education Fund - academies,teacher training,equipment,scholarship. Poverty&Disaster Fund - food & sanitation packs,shelter huts,orphanages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,350
Total expenditure: £2,095

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Hertfordshire
  • Luton
  • Rochdale
  • Throughout London
  • Algeria
  • Bangladesh
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Brazil
  • Burma
  • Cambodia
  • Central African Republic
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Greece
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Liberia
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Philippines
  • Sierra Leone
  • Syria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HELP4UMMAH WELFARE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HABIB-UR-RAHMAN TALUQDAR Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record
Jahid Choudhury Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record
NURUL AHMED Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record
NAZRUL ISLAM Trustee 11 December 2012
AL MASUD FOUNDATION
Recently registered
MUHAMMAD KAYSAR HUSSAIN Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record
SHEIKH MUHAMMAD MUBIN AHMED Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.73k £2.26k £940 £1.82k £2.35k
Total expenditure £3.51k £1.90k £765 £1.55k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 March 2025 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 September 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Haig Close
ST. ALBANS
AL1 5RG
Phone:
07956304567