Financial history KIRKLEES REBOUND TRAMPOLINE CLUB

Charity Number: 1151470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.93k £14.90k £16.90k £18.67k £15.90k
Total expenditure £56.28k £15.35k £19.76k £20.41k £12.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A