NATIONAL RESOURCE CENTRE FOR SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NRCSE provides accredited training and quality assurance for supplementary schools (weekend and after-school classes serving predominantly BAME and migrant communities and providing support in core-curriculum subjects, language, cultural and/or faith tuition). Research in 2011 estimated that 18-28% of all pupils aged 5-16 from minority ethnic backgrounds in England attend supplementary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 January 2013: Standard registration
- 19 July 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1185279 YPF TRUST
- NATIONAL RESOURCE CENTRE FOR SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION (Working name)
- NRCSE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368.68k | £261.71k | £225.93k | £166.38k | £32.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.21k | £308.52k | £244.43k | £177.25k | £107.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.27k | £32.13k | £23.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.99k | N/A | £12.59k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 December 2022 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 December 2022 | 162 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ASSISTING THE EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS BY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) PROVIDING ACCREDITED COURSES FOR SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION; AND (B) ESTABLISHING AND PROMOTING THE APPLICATION OF A QUALITY ASSURANCE FRAMEWORK OF STANDARDS AND CRITERIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window