Trustees CHRISTIAN CONNECTIONS IN SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1150149

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN PETER SYMONS | Chair | 20 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MAY HOPKINS | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenay Lorraine Monds | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grant Ian Hallam | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Geoffrey Thorogood | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Cranch | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES MILES | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.