The Rathbones Group Foundation

Charity Number: 1150432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trustees consider applications for funding when received and resolve to apply the income and capital of the foundation to such charities or for such charitable purposes as they in their discretion think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £377,439
Total expenditure: £299,744

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE RATHBONE BROTHERS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Carolynne Robertson Wilson Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Stuart Furzer Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record
ROBERT PAUL STOCKTON Trustee 20 November 2012
None on record
Rathbones Trust Company Limited Trustee 20 November 2012
THE I M L D FORDE CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE DEREK HILL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE KINGFISHER SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE LADY MARKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SILLITOE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PLANK STEVENSON BURSARY
Received: On time
THE ZENA TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELM TREE TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD PATRICK LANYON Trustee 20 November 2012
NORMAN WALKER TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £239.65k £223.28k £325.15k £338.78k £377.44k
Total expenditure £97.56k £209.81k £209.07k £280.77k £299.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Helen Wilson
30 Gresham Street
LONDON
EC2V 7QN
Phone:
02073990000
Website:

No information available