ANIMAL AID CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is the development of compassion and sensitivity in people of all ages, especially the young, through education about the needs of animals and ways in which they are exploited and made to suffer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 2013: Standard registration
- ANIMAL AID (CAMPAIGN GROUP) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Shephard | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mary Marshall | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Doran | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY ROBERT JOHN KEEN BA HONS | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM MANN BA HONS | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL WATTS BA HONS | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.69k | £17.72k | £1.95k | £108.97k | £78.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.30k | £50.54k | £140.17k | £52.93k | £190.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMPASSION AND SENSITIVITY IN PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, THROUGH EDUCATION ABOUT THE NEEDS OF ANIMALS AND WAYS IN WHICH THEY ARE EXPLOITED AND MADE TO SUFFER, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO ADOPT A CRUELTY-FREE (VEGAN) LIFESTYLE THAT PROMOTES THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS AND THE ENVIRONMENT AND BENEFITS OF HUMAN HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD CHAPEL
BRADFORD STREET
TONBRIDGE
KENT
TN9 1AW
- Phone:
- 01732364546
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window