WIVENHOE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pre-school offers appropriate play, education and care facilities for children. Enhancing the development of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £72,933 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 13 December 2012: Standard registration
- 28 May 2013: Funds received from 1029459 WIVENHOE PRESCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Tarala | Chair | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sadler | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Sparrow | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
OLIVIA REEVES | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA CLUBB | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.93k | £67.02k | £69.83k | £81.10k | £87.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.24k | £64.13k | £71.98k | £79.17k | £84.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £35.86k | £48.17k | £47.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.76k | £72.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAR 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 4.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 4.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 4.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRESCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wivenhoe Pre School
101A High Street
Wivenhoe
COLCHESTER
CO7 9AB
- Phone:
- 01206823835
- Email:
- info@martynlewis.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window