EXPLORA SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education by providing funds and facilitating the establishment of scholarships in higher education for the dependents of severely wounded and deceased Armed Forces and Security Services personnel who were in Government Service when killed or injured; this includes spouses and partners, and Trustees will consider support to personnel who have been medically discharged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain David Henson MBE RE | Trustee | 20 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HARRY MARMENT | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS STEWART LE CARPENTIER | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10 | £225 | £0 | £892 | |
|
Total expenditure | £210 | £180 | £225 | £892 | £892 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2021 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: (1) To advance education by providing funds and facilitating the establishment of scholarships in lower or higher education for the dependents of severely wounded and deceased Armed Forces, Security Services, Fire Services, Ambulance Services and Police Services personnel, who were in Government Service when killed or injured. In circumstances as determined by the trustees, to facilitate Armed Forces, Security Services, Fire Services, Ambulance Services, and Police Services personnel who may be retired and are sufficiently physically and/or mentally fit for any such educational courses as determined by the appropriate medical release. (2) To provide financial assistance for the purposes of supporting the lower or higher education of the dependents of severely wounded and deceased or retired Armed Forces, Security Services, Fire Services, Ambulance Services, and Police Services personnel who were in Government Service at the time of injury or death. In circumstances as determined by the trustees, to facilitate Armed Forces, Security Services, Fire Services, Ambulance Services and Police Services personnel who may be retired and are sufficiently physically and/or mentally fit for any such educational course as determined by the appropriate medical release. 3) Such further education as determined by the applicant, to be considered by the trustees in all forms of education including online courses available, such as Cyber Security and other appropriate courses. 4) Such other purposes as are exclusively charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine.
Area of benefit
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ONLINE COURSES, SUCH AS CYBER SECURITY AND OTHER APPROPRIATE COURSES. BY PROVIDING FUNDS AND FACILITATING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOLARSHIPS IN LOWER OR HIGHER EDUCATION FOR THE DEPENDENTS OF SEVERELY WOUNDED AND DECEASED ARMED FORCES, SECURITY SERVICES, FIRE SERVICES, AMBULANCE SERVICES AND POLICE SERVICES PERSONNEL, WHO WERE IN GOVERNMENT SERVICE WHEN KILLED OR INJURED. IN CIRCUMSTANCES AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO FACILITATE ARMED FORCES, SECURITY SERVICES, FIRE SERVICES, AMBULANCE SERVICES, AND POLICE SERVICES PERSONNEL WHO MAY BE RETIRED AND ARE SUFFICIENTLY PHYSICALLY AND/OR MENTALLY FIT FOR ANY SUCH EDUCATIONAL COURSES AS DETERMINED BY THE APPROPRIATE MEDICAL RELEASE. (2) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUPPORTING THE LOWER OR HIGHER EDUCATION OF THE DEPENDENTS OF SEVERELY WOUNDED AND DECEASED OR RETIRED ARMED FORCES, SECURITY SERVICES, FIRE SERVICES, AMBULANCE SERVICES, AND POLICE SERVICES PERSONNEL WHO WERE IN GOVERNMENT SERVICE AT THE TIME OF INJURY OR DEATH. IN CIRCUMSTANCES AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO FACILITATE ARMED FORCES, SECURITY SERVICES, FIRE SERVICES, AMBULANCE SERVICES AND POLICE SERVICES PERSONNEL WHO MAY BE RETIRED AND ARE SUFFICIENTLY PHYSICALLY AND/OR MENTALLY FIT FOR ANY SUCH EDUCATIONAL COURSE AS DETERMINED BY THE APPROPRIATE MEDICAL RELEASE. 3) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Talina Centre
23a Bagleys Lane
London
SW6 2BW
- Phone:
- 02077363420
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window