Financial history MALPAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1150391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.29k £11.77k £8.87k £10.96k £10.35k
Total expenditure £5.74k £4.85k £7.82k £15.97k £6.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £792 £1.62k