MALPAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall for the benefit of the inhabitants of the village of Malpas, and the parish of St Clements and neighbouring parishes, including use of the property for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreation and education, in the interests of social welfare and with the objectives of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,619 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Raymond Ibbotson | Chair | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Derek Cable | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Susan Mitchell | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Henwood | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Leach | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Swift | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hugh James | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER CRAVEN | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SELBY | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £11.77k | £8.87k | £10.96k | £10.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.74k | £4.85k | £7.82k | £15.97k | £6.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £792 | £1.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF MALPAS AND THE PARISH OF ST CLEMENT AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF MALPAS AND THE PARISH OF ST CLEMENT AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Old Nursery
Malpas
TRURO
Cornwall
TR1 1GS
- Phone:
- 07970 563922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window