THE DIABETES CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TDC UK has been established to help people suffering from diabetes in UK. We arrange educational sessions and gatherings to create awareness about diabetes. We educate people about the various types of diabetes and their management. We encourage people to adopt a healthy life style to help curb diabetes. We show people how to live an active and successful life while living with diabetes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 07 May 2013: Standard registration
- TDC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURAD ALI | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omar Shahzaad Nadeem | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr RASHID QADIR | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD AYYAZ BUTT MBBS. FRCP | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SOHAIL RANA MBBS | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.04k | £18.95k | £17.95k | £13.36k | £11.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.43k | £23.56k | £16.11k | £25.30k | £956 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 June 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS(THE OBJECTS)ARE;THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN PAKISTAN AND SOUTH ASIA.(1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PATIENTS,SUFFERERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF DIABETES IN PAKISTAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE(2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DIABETES.TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF DIABETES AT DIABETES TREATMENT CENTRES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT,FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS,SUFFERERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF DIABETES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES,SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES,FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 GREYSTOKE PARK TERRACE
LONDON
W5 1JL
- Phone:
- 07711390750
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window