SHEKINAH SHUR MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs as set out in schedule attached to the Memorandum and Article. To help relieve sickness through prayer, and help relieve financial hardship and promote and preserve good health by the provision of short term interest free loans, meals or services of any kind including through the provision of counselling and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 17 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sidione Rosemarie McLeod | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|||||
RUEL O'BRIAN STEWART | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR SONIA ROSETTA STEWART | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DORRISY ORIEDI | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/01/2020 | 25/01/2021 | 25/01/2022 | 25/01/2023 | 25/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.21k | £76.37k | £73.89k | £73.69k | £99.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.56k | £51.56k | £57.91k | £73.39k | £89.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.55k | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 January 2024 | 26 December 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2024 | 26 December 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 January 2023 | 13 January 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2023 | 13 January 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 January 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 January 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 January 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JAN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40A JESSOPS LANE
GEDLING
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 4BQ
- Phone:
- 01158556042
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window