AGE UK NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote the wellbeing of people over the age of 50 and make later life a fulfilling and enjoyable experience. We are an independent local charity supporting older people within North East Lincolnshire in a friendly,relaxed environment.PopIn Cafe; Luncheon Club;Toe Nail Cutting; Legal Advice;Social Activities; Information & Advice; Shop; Volunteering Opportunities; Hairdressing: Manicure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,800 from 1 government contract(s) and £114,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Richard Ekberg | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hammond | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Chidwick | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Martin Trenchard | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHONA MARGARET ORTEGA | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN MAGGS MBE | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £787.60k | £305.54k | £256.09k | £220.68k | £249.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.89k | £271.76k | £280.15k | £340.80k | £369.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | £5.00k | £9.80k | £9.80k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.86k | £23.39k | £120.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £561.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £36.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £192 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £161.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £225.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £53.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY (THE “OBJECTS”) IS ESTABLISHED AND TO WHICH IT IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE IN AND AROUND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE 4.1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; 4.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 4.3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); 4.4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 4.5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 4.6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Age UK North East Lincolnshire
27 Osborne Street
GRIMSBY
North East Lincolnshire
DN31 1EY
- Phone:
- 01472344976
- Email:
- admin@ageuknelincs.org.uk
- Website:
-
ageuk.org.uk/northeastlincs
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window