AMMAN VALLEY ART GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group is active in promoting painting and drawing through exhibitions and club activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 01 January 1966: Standard registration
- A V A G (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Funnell Mrs | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Adams | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Chinnery | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £2.08k | £1.94k | £4.50k | £3.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £3.68k | £3.45k | £3.74k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF 1953 AMENDED 1965
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE APPRECIATION OF ART, HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS OF THE WORKS OF LOCAL AND OTHER ARTISTS AND ARRANGING VISITS TO ART GALLERIES.
Area of benefit
AMMANFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Parc Henry Lane
AMMANFORD
Dyfed
SA18 2EH
- Phone:
- 07745341220
- Email:
- pamadams@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window