ALDRIDGE YOUTH THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Theatre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,832 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 13 June 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIA ASH | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.80k | £27.44k | £35.75k | £47.43k | £45.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.67k | £9.77k | £33.62k | £39.36k | £38.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.00k | £8.00k | N/A | £1.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 16 MAR 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ACTING, SPEECH-TRAINING AND THE VARIOUS ASPECTS OF STAGE MANAGEMENT, AND THE PRESENTATION OF STAGE PERFORMANCES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF RULES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF STAFFORD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALDRIDGE YOUTH THEATRE
NODDY PARK ROAD
WALSALL
WS9 8NQ
- Phone:
- 01922458615
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window