TALKING SENSE!

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent advice and support to parents of children with special educational needs and disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Stanway | Chair | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Evans | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Garbett | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEN UPTON | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE MOORE | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY ADAMSON | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Yarnall | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.00k | £64.75k | £56.00k | £108.00k | £125.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.00k | £41.01k | £50.00k | £76.00k | £45.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 0 – 25 YEARS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT, BY: A. PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE FAMILIES TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR CHILDREN; B. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING SUCH FAMILIES AND THEIR CHILDREN, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; C. PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH HELP THEM TO BETTER IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 Westbrook Avenue
Aldridge
Walsall
WS9 0BZ
- Phone:
- 07457403454
- Email:
- enquiries@talking-sense.org
- Website:
-
talking-sense.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window