Financial history CHIROPRACTIC RESEARCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1151627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £73.19k £1.34k £70.36k £107.60k £80.61k
Total expenditure £113.03k £102.24k £109.29k £5.12k £65.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A