THE FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve, repair, maintain and enhance the Parish Church of St John the Baptist, Meopham and its monuments, fittings, stained glass, furniture and chattels in the churchyard for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 07 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip William Harcus | Chair | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
cheryl lilian price | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Michael Fairweather | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Merry | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA BARNES | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WADE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £1.86k | £1.92k | £2.91k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.83k | £811 | £50 | £5.83k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, MEOPHAM AND ITS MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodhill Cottage
Wood Hill
Meopham
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA13 0DJ
- Phone:
- 07930321599
- Email:
- cherylprice@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window