Trustees THE FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM PARISH CHURCH
Charity number: 1151922
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip William Harcus | Chair | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
cheryl lilian price | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Michael Fairweather | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Merry | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA BARNES | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WADE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.